SD HB1193 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain requirements relating to in situ leach mining.
Title
Establish certain requirements relating to in situ leach mining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 410 |
2014-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 276 |
2014-01-31 | House | First read in House H.J. 247 |