SD HB1191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-16)
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 691
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legalize the growth, production, and processing of industrial hemp and derivative products in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalize the growth, production, and processing of industrial hemp and derivative products in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House Veto override (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateVeto override, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 691
2019-03-12SenateVeto override, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 11. H.J. 721
2019-03-12SenateVetoed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 719
2019-03-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 720
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 685
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 713
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 708
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 637
2019-03-06SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 636 Amendment 1191jh
2019-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 618
2019-03-05SenateSenate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 618
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 617
2019-03-05SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 614 Amendment 1191jg
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 547
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 360
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 359 Amendment 1191jd
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 317
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1191jc
2019-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 251

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1191&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1191P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1191HAG.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1191H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1191S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1191ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27907&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28114&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29016&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29189&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29194&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29266&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29269&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29366&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29414&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29387&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback