SD HB1177 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish provisions regarding ejection of persons from certain lodging establishments and recreational vehicle facilities.
Title
Establish provisions regarding ejection of persons from certain lodging establishments and recreational vehicle facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 410 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 398 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 183 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 198 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 198 Amendment 1177A |
2022-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |