SD HB1177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide an opportunity to view a sonogram and hear the child's heartbeat prior to an abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide an opportunity to view a sonogram and hear the child's heartbeat prior to an abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 755
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 747
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 6. H.J. 722
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 715
2019-03-07SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 657 Amendment 1177bts
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 657
2019-03-07SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 645
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 624
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 520
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 538 Amendment 1177wtb
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 537
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 501 Amendment 1177wta
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1177wa
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 233

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1177&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1177P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1177HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1177H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1177S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1177ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28645&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28825&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29232&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29315&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29419&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback