SD HB1172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for cooperation with federal officials in matters of immigration.
Title
Provide for cooperation with federal officials in matters of immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - House - House Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 498 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1172ka |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 401 |
2019-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 414 |
2019-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 413 |
2019-02-13 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 395 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 34. H.J. 394 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 394 Amendment 1172ba |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 25. H.J. 370 |
2019-02-08 | House | Local Government Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 350 |
2019-02-08 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 7. |
2019-02-08 | House | Local Government Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2019-02-08 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 341 |
2019-02-07 | House | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 320 |
2019-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 220 |