SD HB1171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 4. S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allow certain veterans to attend courses offered at postsecondary technical institutes without payment of tuition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow certain veterans to attend courses offered at postsecondary technical institutes without payment of tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Failed to concur (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 4. S.J. 694
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 725
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 714 Amendment Cc1171a
2019-03-11SenateSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 684 Amendment Cc1171A
2019-03-07SenateHouse of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 685
2019-03-07SenateHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 684
2019-03-07SenateIntent to reconsider H.J. 684
2019-03-07SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 678
2019-03-07SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 662
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 613
2019-03-05SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 613 Amendment 1171wa
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 535
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 429
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 439
2019-02-13HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 405
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 220

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1171&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1171P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1171S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28262&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28418&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28954&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29186&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29296&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29322&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29324&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29432&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29445&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback