SD HB1169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the arts and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the arts and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 478 |
2021-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 H.J. 554 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 535 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 448 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 448 Amendment 1169C |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1169A |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 364 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 429 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 381 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 166 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |