SD HB1167 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the term of service of a grand jury.
Title
Revise the term of service of a grand jury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566 | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 435 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 21. H.J. 558 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 445 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219 |