SD HB1166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to support the Ellsworth Air Force Base and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to support the Ellsworth Air Force Base and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 478 |
2021-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 H.J. 554 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 534 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 448 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 447 Amendment 1166E |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1166A |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 364 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 428 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 381 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 166 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |