SD HB1165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create the trust fund for unclaimed property and to provide for the transfer of certain unobligated cash balances.
Title
Create the trust fund for unclaimed property and to provide for the transfer of certain unobligated cash balances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 415 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1165D |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |