SD HB1161 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement for certain township, municipal, and school district fiscal reports to be submitted to county auditors.
Title
Repeal the requirement for certain township, municipal, and school district fiscal reports to be submitted to county auditors.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Tom Holmes [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R] |
Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 24, 2017 H.J. 540 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 511 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 439 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 417 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 391 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 356 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 344 |
2017-02-07 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-07 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 320 |
2017-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 250 |