SD HB1161 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that an out-of-country foreign judgment need not be recognized if the cause of action resulted in a defamation judgment obtained in a jurisdiction outside the United States, unless a court in this state first determines that the defamation law applied in the foreign court's adjudication provided at least as much protection for freedom of speech and press as would be provided in this state.
Title
Provide that an out-of-country foreign judgment need not be recognized if the cause of action resulted in a defamation judgment obtained in a jurisdiction outside the United States, unless a court in this state first determines that the defamation law applied in the foreign court's adjudication provided at least as much protection for freedom of speech and press as would be provided in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 566 | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 435 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 11. H.J. 544 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 445 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 218 |