SD HB1158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the posting of public notice for meetings of public bodies.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the posting of public notice for meetings of public bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 761 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 560 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 564 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 375 |
2013-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 341 |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-05 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 300 |
2013-02-05 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1158ta |
2013-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 154 |