SD HB1157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding challenges to candidate nominating petitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding challenges to candidate nominating petitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-04SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 579
2019-02-26SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 525
2019-02-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512
2019-02-22SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 466
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 368
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 372
2019-02-11HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-11HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 350
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 219
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 204

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback