SD HB1156 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Scheduled for hearing
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 House Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the conduct of certain physical examinations or screenings on students in a school district without parental consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prohibit the conduct of certain physical examinations or screenings on students in a school district without parental consent.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-10HouseReferred to House Judiciary, Passed H.J. 240
2020-02-04HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 115
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 96

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback