SD HB1156 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designate the accordion as the official state musical instrument.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate the accordion as the official state musical instrument.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 219
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 204

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback