SD HB1155 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Remove certain restrictions on gifts of agricultural land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remove certain restrictions on gifts of agricultural land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 434
2021-03-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
2021-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 350
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 383
2021-02-23HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-23HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-16HouseReferred to House Taxation, Passed H.J. 292
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 209
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 178
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback