SD HB1155 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the marking of certain anemometer towers used for wind energy testing purposes.
Title
Require the marking of certain anemometer towers used for wind energy testing purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Tabled (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Tabled (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 795 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 504 | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 460 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 570 | |
2010-02-22 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-22 | Commerce Title amended, Passed Amendment 1155ttb | |
2010-02-22 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 505 | |
2010-02-22 | Commerce Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1155tc | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | Commerce Reconsidered, Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Commerce Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 347 | |
2010-02-10 | Commerce Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8. | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 217 |