SD HB1154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit employment contracts restricting competitive health care practices.
Title
Prohibit employment contracts restricting competitive health care practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2021-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 16. S.J. 441 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 365 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 27. H.J. 421 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 421 Amendment 1154E |
2021-02-24 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1154B |
2021-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |