SD HB1152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish rights regarding the disposition of a person's remains.
Title
Establish rights regarding the disposition of a person's remains.
Sponsors
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Peri Pourier [D] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689 |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 479 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 517 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 413 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 411 Amendment 1152C |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1152B |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 257 |
2022-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 283 |
2022-02-09 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1152A |
2022-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 127 |