SD HB1150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide definitions regarding the crime of rape.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide definitions regarding the crime of rape.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
2021-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-10SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 237
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
2021-02-08HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-08HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 178
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback