SD HB1138 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding the issuance of state park camping permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding the issuance of state park camping permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4.
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Reconsidered, Passed
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2.
2021-03-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 3.
2021-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 364
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 24. H.J. 417
2021-02-23HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2.
2021-02-23HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1138B
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-18HouseReferred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 323
2021-02-01HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 166
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback