SD HB1133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce fees for annual state park licenses for South Dakota residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce fees for annual state park licenses for South Dakota residents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Local Government: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseLocal Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-18HouseReferred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 323
2021-02-01HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 166
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback