SD HB1133 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a rebuttable presumption in favor of joint physical custody of a minor child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a rebuttable presumption in favor of joint physical custody of a minor child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2020-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 305
2020-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 339
2020-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 339 Amendment 1133E
2020-02-18HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
2020-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-13HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6.
2020-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 117
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 98

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback