SD HB1132 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Add dental hygienists to the list of mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add dental hygienists to the list of mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
2021-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2021 H.J. 434
2021-02-25SenateSigned by the President S.J. 359
2021-02-24HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 391
2021-02-23SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 330
2021-02-22SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1
2021-02-22SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 260
2021-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 287
2021-02-10HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 2
2021-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 154

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback