SD HB1132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the treatment of alcohol and drug abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the treatment of alcohol and drug abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateJudiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 624
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 520
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 535
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 488
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1132wb
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseJudiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1132kta
2019-02-20HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1132wa
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 198

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback