SD HB1131 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 49-5)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 49-5)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the use of misleading identification for telephonic communications.
Title
Prohibit the use of misleading identification for telephonic communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2020 H.J. 446 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 389 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 433 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 356 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 229 |
2020-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 0. H.J. 274 |
2020-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 261 |
2020-02-10 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |