SD HB1130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish requirements for the presentation of a written statement regarding the discontinuance of a drug-induced abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish requirements for the presentation of a written statement regarding the discontinuance of a drug-induced abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 568
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 528
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 500
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 401
2021-03-01SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 330
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 334
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 333 Amendment 1130F
2021-02-17HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
2021-02-17HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1130B
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 154

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback