SD HB1129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the session law authorizing the Board of Regents to contract for the design and construction of a new dairy research and extension farm on the campus of South Dakota State University, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Repeal the session law authorizing the Board of Regents to contract for the design and construction of a new dairy research and extension farm on the campus of South Dakota State University, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] |
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Chris Kassin [R] | Rep. Dennis Krull [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Will Mortenson [R] | Sen. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Rep. Tony Venhuizen [R] | Rep. James Wangsness [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 H.J. 420 |
2024-02-23 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2024 H.J. 384 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 390 |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 369 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 366 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 297 |
2024-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 16. H.J. 297 |
2024-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 284 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 144 |