SD HB1129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the provision of telecommunications device location information to law enforcement agencies.
Title
Authorize the provision of telecommunications device location information to law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 480 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 396 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 344 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 370 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 306 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 229 |
2020-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 9. H.J. 274 |
2020-02-10 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-10 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129A |
2020-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |