SD HB1127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding official meetings conducted by teleconference.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding official meetings conducted by teleconference.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Ryan Cwach [D] |
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] |
Rep. Jess Olson [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 450 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 420 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 225 |
2021-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 242 |
2021-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229 |
2021-02-04 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 154 |