SD HB1126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation relating to the protection of public safety.
Title
Accommodate legislation relating to the protection of public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Tabled (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 479 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 456 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 438 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 425 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 306 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 11. H.J. 377 |
2022-02-16 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 116 |