SD HB1125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Define adjournment for the counting of ballots.
Title
Define adjournment for the counting of ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 2 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 481 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 384 |
2021-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 435 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 359 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 237 |
2021-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 12. H.J. 257 |
2021-02-08 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 3 |
2021-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 155 |