SD HB1124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify certain requirements concerning the printing of ballots.
Title
Modify certain requirements concerning the printing of ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 450 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 418 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 330 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 336 |
2021-02-17 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-17 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. Amendment 1124B |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 155 |