SD HB1124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an increase in the assessment against certain treated land.
Title
Provide for an increase in the assessment against certain treated land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 502 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 477 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 338 |
2020-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 367 |
2020-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352 |
2020-02-20 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 107 |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading House H.J. 83 |