SD HB1122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize township boards to designate certain roads as no maintenance roads.
Title
Authorize township boards to designate certain roads as no maintenance roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 628 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 587 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 550 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 503 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1122fd |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 355 |
2015-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 348 |
2015-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 348 Amendment 1122fc |
2015-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 333 |
2015-02-05 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 302 |
2015-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 180 |