SD HB1120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include carbon dioxide and carbon dioxide capture companies in certain provisions regarding pipeline taxation.
Title
Include carbon dioxide and carbon dioxide capture companies in certain provisions regarding pipeline taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 405 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 173 |
2022-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 185 |
2022-02-01 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 105 |