SD HB1120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2. H.J. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate funds for forest health and resilience.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate funds for forest health and resilience.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseJoint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 2. H.J. 563
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 394
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 373
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 356
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 317
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1120wa
2019-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 196

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback