SD HB1117 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to support the small and mid-sized manufacturers, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to support the small and mid-sized manufacturers, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] |
Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] | Rep. David Kull [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tim Reisch [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Tabled (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 394 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 368 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 388 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. J.J. 5 |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed J.J. 5 Amendment 1117A |
2023-02-22 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-02-14 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 96 |