SD HB1117 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 57. H.J. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions for public meetings held by teleconference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions for public meetings held by teleconference.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 57. H.J. 241
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 241 Amendment 1117A
2021-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229
2021-02-04HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
2021-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 154

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback