SD HB1116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit the conduct of certain physical examinations or screenings on students in a school district without parental consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit the conduct of certain physical examinations or screenings on students in a school district without parental consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 415
2019-02-13HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 398
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 398
2019-02-11HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 7.
2019-02-08HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1116ca
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 195

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback