SD HB1114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain requirements for students enrolling in resident school districts or assigned schools after participating in open enrollment.
Title
Establish certain requirements for students enrolling in resident school districts or assigned schools after participating in open enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 759 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on 2:50 p.m., March 8, 2018. H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 737 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 701 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 653 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 484 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 457 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 394 |
2018-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | House | Education Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 127 |