SD HB1113 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain references to the International Building Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain references to the International Building Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 02, 2021 H.J. 455
2021-03-01SenateSigned by the President S.J. 369
2021-02-25HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 431
2021-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 344
2021-02-23SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 236
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
2021-02-08HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-08HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 153

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback