SD HB1103 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the qualification process for municipal office.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the qualification process for municipal office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2016 H.J. 405 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 295 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 373 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 264 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 243 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 219 |
2016-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 264 |
2016-02-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-02 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 229 |
2016-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 181 |