SD HB1103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt credit health insurers from certain provisions related to preexisting conditions.
Title
Exempt credit health insurers from certain provisions related to preexisting conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 605 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 574 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 327 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 283 |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 247 |
2013-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed Amendment 1103jta |
2013-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 111 |