SD HB1100 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Scheduled for hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modify the medical marijuana program, to create an interim committee to recommend implementation of the medical marijuana program, and to remove and clarify penalties for marijuana use under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify the medical marijuana program, to create an interim committee to recommend implementation of the medical marijuana program, and to remove and clarify penalties for marijuana use under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Joint - Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion to amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-03-11SenateSenate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 477
2021-03-10HouseReport out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 549
2021-03-10SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 472
2021-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 547
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 441
2021-03-08SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 440 Amendment 1100M
2021-03-08SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 437 Amendment 1100N
2021-03-03SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-03-03SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 1 Amendment 1100L
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 365
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 28. H.J. 409
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 402 Amendment 1100F
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 401 Amendment 1100H
2021-02-23HouseDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 358
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337
2021-02-17HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-10HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1100A
2021-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-27HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/21938
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/213931.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/217774.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218599.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219455.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219968.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/217063.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218207.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219153.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219796.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219795.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69379
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70132
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70611
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70614
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70888
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70889
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71067
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71076
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71081

Bill Comments

feedback