SD HB1094 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain programs regarding transparency of the petition circulation process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain programs regarding transparency of the petition circulation process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 14. H.J. 662
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 13. S.J. 597
2019-03-04SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 597 Amendment 1094ja
2019-02-27SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 533
2019-02-27SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1094wc
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 475
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 17. H.J. 468
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 407
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1094wa
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1094&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1094P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1094HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1094SST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1094S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1094ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28198&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28609&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28947&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29110&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29270&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback