SD HB1093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish legal standards applicable to petition challenges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish legal standards applicable to petition challenges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 609
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 563
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 520
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 520
2019-02-22HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 508
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1093wb
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1093wa
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback