SD HB1091 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend provisions of the insurance statutes regarding producer recommendations and responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend provisions of the insurance statutes regarding producer recommendations and responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-24HouseSigned by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
2023-02-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 16, 2023 H.J. 312
2023-02-15SenateSigned by the President S.J. 278
2023-02-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 287
2023-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 230
2023-02-07SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 16
2023-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2023-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 163
2023-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 181
2023-01-30HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 171
2023-01-25HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2023-01-25HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2023-01-25HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1091A
2023-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2023-01-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 60

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback