SD HB1090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain amateur sports coaches from sales tax.
Title
Exempt certain amateur sports coaches from sales tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Rep. Kristin Conzet [R] | Rep. Scott Craig [R] |
Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Christine Erickson [R] | Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] |
Rep. Anne Hajek [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Steve Hickey [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Rep. Patty Miller [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Sen. Chuck Jones [R] |
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Chuck Welke [D] |
Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 389 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 247 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 17. H.J. 195 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 195 Amendment 1090fb |
2013-01-24 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 3. H.J. 165 |
2013-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 97 |